Governing document TARALOKA

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH JANUARY 1977 AS AMENDED 3RD DECEMBER 1977, 7TH DECEMBER 1986, 16TH OCTOBER 1987 1ST MAY 1997 AND 7TH OCTOBER 1999 AND 8 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION IN PARTICULAR: (A) TO ENCOURAGE MEMBERS AND OTHERS TO LIVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHING OF THE BUDDHA. (B) TO SUPPORT ORDAINED MEMBERS OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST ORDER AND OTHER DULY ORDAINED BUDDHISTS, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE COUNCIL OF THE CENTRE. (C) TO MAINTAIN CLOSE COMMUNICATION WITH AND WORK UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST ORDER AND IN CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER GROUPS WITH THE SAME OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.