Trustees TARALOKA

Charity Number: 274500
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TANIA ROE Chair 26 September 2016
None on record
Ann Cronin Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Joanna Burbidge Trustee 06 August 2018
None on record
Virginia Gail Carter Trustee 04 November 2014
None on record
ROSEMARY DENYS Trustee 15 September 2011
None on record
MS Hazel BAKER Trustee
None on record
MS RACHEL JANE LOVERING Trustee
None on record