Trustees THE BRITISH COUNCIL

Charity number: 209131
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Paul Thompson Chair 04 January 2024
THE CHELSEA PHYSIC GARDEN COMPANY
Received: On time
Paul Woodgates Trustee 11 September 2023
ADVANCE HE
Received: On time
Dr Katherine Radford MBE Trustee 11 June 2023
None on record
Professor Wendy Cowan Alexander Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Sarah Louise Sands Trustee 19 September 2022
None on record
Dr David John Lefevre Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
Richard Mark Hookway Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
Rageh Omaar Trustee 23 September 2020
THE ROYAL UNITED SERVICES INSTITUTE FOR DEFENCE AND SECURITY STUDIES
Received: On time
Professor Malcolm Colin Press Trustee 15 September 2020
None on record
Sushil Kumar Saluja Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Thomas Drew CMG Trustee 13 February 2020
None on record
Fiona Salzen Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
CLARE REDDINGTON Trustee 01 May 2019
WISE CHILDREN LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr Stephen John Deuchar CBE Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record
MARK PETER BEDDY Trustee 07 October 2018
None on record