Governing document Waverley Abbey Trust
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/02/1986 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/06/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/2013 AS AMENDED ON 17 FEB 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 APR 2023
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WORLDWIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.