BALLETBOYZ LTD

Charity number: 1088336
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £300.00k £300.00k £300.00k
Other income £1.16m £1.73m £1.55m £783.59k £677.79k
Total expenditure £1.14m £1.88m £1.29m £1.20m £1.24m