THE BEAMSLEY PROJECT CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust provides short stay facilities for disabled persons and their carers,visiting the Yorkshire Dales, without discrimination as to race, gender, age or creed. It has as a priority the encouragement of independence for the disabled person.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People
7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 16 May 1989: Standard registration
- THE BEAMSLEY PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Lesley Paterson | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Tomlinson | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
EDWINA JUDITH SIMPSON OLBY | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|||||
LYNDA DUTTINE | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|||||
Michael Perry | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE ANN PHYPERS | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
David Charlton | Trustee | 12 January 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.65k | £100.09k | £71.07k | £146.37k | £106.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.44k | £143.08k | £97.21k | £113.65k | £146.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £37.55k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
27 July 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 07 February 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 07 February 2020 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 MAY 1989 AS AMENDED 8 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE LIFE OF THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED AND SUCH PERSONS AS HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND MORE PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF A RESIDENTIAL CENTRE AT PART OF THE FORMER BEAMSLEY METHODIST CHAPEL IN NORTH YORKSHIRE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARROGATE ROAD
HAZELWOOD
SKIPTON
NORTH YORKSHIRE
BD23 6JA
- Phone:
- 01756710255
- Email:
- info@beamsleyproject.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window