Trustees CAMBRIDGE ROYAL ALBERT BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Charity number: 204757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD HAROLD THACKRAY FCIOB | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rasiklal Haridas Kotecha | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger James Winter | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Bullock | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|||||
John Edwin Martin | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND ANNE BIRD | Trustee | 13 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CAROLINE MCCAVE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.