Trustees THE LONDON NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity number: 206228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Elizabeth Knight | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Maureen Elizabeth Parry | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Annie Elizabeth Wilson | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Robin Alastair Blades | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Jan Felicity Hewlett | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Anke Lizbeth Marsh | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Kat Duke | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Elizabeth Andrew | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Woodward | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Joanne Hatton | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
David Bevan | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Linnell | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Gehan De Silva Wijeyeratne | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL JAMES WEST | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.