Trustees THE SAVE THE CHILDREN FUND
Charity number: 213890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Thomas George WINTER | Chair | 13 January 2020 |
|
|||||||
Laura Catherine King | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jason Daniel Graeme Allen | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Caroline Long | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Kirtbir Kaur Chahal | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
TIMOTHY FALLOWFIELD | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|||||||
Catherine Ann Doran | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Tsitsi Dadirai Chawatama-Kwambana | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
JESSICA CATHERINE GLADSTONE | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|||||||
Razia Khan | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Kajal Odedra | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Babatunde Soyoye | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dianna Patricia Melrose | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Arabella Elizabeth Duffield | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Kathleen Fahy | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.