Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SOUTH EAST SOMERSET BRANCH
Charity number: 264783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEE CHAPMAN | Chair | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lucy Paull | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Jane Savage | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Frank Comber | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PIERS FARLEY | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHELE WESTLAKE | Trustee | 06 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER LUSCOMBE | Trustee | 06 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHANI BELINDA THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ANN BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN KENNETH BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.