Trustees THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX
Charity number: 279057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Swindells | Chair | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roxane Heaton | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anne Wilson | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bevis Watts | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Allen | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janine La Rosa | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Hughes | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
JABBAR SARDAR | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Finola Mary McDonnell | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Lucinda Margaret Bell | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MOGFORD | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Ann-Marie Harkin | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.