Trustees THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION GREATER LONDON WEST
Charity number: 305817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Axbey | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Garrett | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Flohr | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
rosalyn townsend | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Claire Hillier | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Roberts | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Junemann | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Joan Pearson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marguerite Landells | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE DONOVAN | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Crimmings | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET HILL | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.