Trustees THE ACADEMY OF ANCIENT MUSIC
Charity number: 1085485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL DAVID BAUMANN CBE | Chair | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Gwyn Adams | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm James Gammie CBE KC | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Theresa O'Neill | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN ELEY | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daryl Fielding | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Victoria Barker | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Clark | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELISE DOMINIQUE BADOY | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary de Friend | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kim Sidney Waldock | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM BEATTIE NICHOLSON | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.