Trustees THE ACADEMY OF ANCIENT MUSIC

Charity number: 1085485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL DAVID BAUMANN CBE Chair 28 June 2018
None on record
Daryl Fielding Trustee 13 July 2022
BRITISH HEART FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PELICAN CANCER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Jane Victoria Barker Trustee 13 January 2022
None on record
Alan John Clark Trustee 29 April 2021
None on record
Helen Mary Barbara Sprott Trustee 28 January 2021
None on record
ELISE DOMINIQUE BADOY Trustee 28 January 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Mary de Friend Trustee 07 February 2019
None on record
Kim Sidney Waldock Trustee 26 September 2018
None on record
GRAHAM BEATTIE NICHOLSON Trustee 01 January 2016
HOO CHURCH BULDING TRUST
Received: On time
Madeleine Tattersall Trustee 18 November 2013
None on record
HUGH BURKITT Trustee 10 June 2013
None on record