Governance JOSEPH MINISTRIES
Charity number: 1121841
Charity reporting is overdue by 392 days
Registration history:
- 06 December 2007: Standard registration
- 09 November 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 July 2012: Re-registered
- 09 August 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 August 2014: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.