Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY & ALL SAINTS, BINGHAM
Charity number: 1131217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev'd Jon Wright | Chair | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Mary Black | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIMON CHARLES KIRSOP | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID MILLER | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Sarah Forbes-Buckingham | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
linda Winifred Walden | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kate Gent | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PHILIP WOODMAN | Trustee | 16 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
VIVIEN URSULA DYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER KIRKBRIDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAPTAIN ALAN STEPHEN COOPER CA MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.