THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY & ALL SAINTS, BINGHAM

Charity number: 1131217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £124.29k £118.48k £106.15k £123.09k £106.22k
Total expenditure £129.66k £116.31k £116.02k £122.53k £103.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £403 £2.91k