Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY & ALL SAINTS, BINGHAM

Charity number: 1131217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 December 2019 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 December 2019 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window