Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY MAGDALENE, ASHTON UPON MERSEY
Charity number: 1133105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE REVEREND STEPHEN BRIAN RANKIN | Chair |
|
||||||
Rotimi Bajela | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen MacMillan | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Nathan | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nathan James Gregory | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Margaret Hyde | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
IAN THWAITES | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John William Vaughan | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Charles Fosh | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dave Atkinson | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Christine Jones | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANN MCBURNEY | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|||||
HELEN ANNE JARVIS | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Kay | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GILL HART | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN MACFADEN | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|||||
JEFFREY MCBURNEY | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY BARNES | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
LORNA ELLEN HITCHIN | Trustee | 18 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY GILLIAN SIGEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN MARGARET HEYS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET VIVIENNE DARLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AVTAR DAVINDAR SINGH DIGGWA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA ANNE SHIMMINGS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.