Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY MAGDALENE, ASHTON UPON MERSEY

Charity number: 1133105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £652.58k £508.61k £500.40k £448.86k £456.50k
Total expenditure £724.05k £537.43k £475.50k £428.01k £428.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £459.65k £313.78k £326.36k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £29.19k £15.84k £17.26k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £162.29k £159.41k £156.57k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £205 £61 £214 N/A N/A
Income - Other £1.24k £600 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £3.00k £1.50k £10.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £723.91k £537.31k £475.41k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £134 £121 £83 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A