Trustees BRITISH SCOUTING OVERSEAS AREA SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1151702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Maria Warne MSc BSc | Chair | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Trevor James Plowright | Trustee | 02 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Neive Cosker | Trustee | 02 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Anthony Dunn | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Victoria Mitchell | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Robin Chow Shiun Ngeow | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sebastien Eldridge | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Charlotte Emma Thompson | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Nathan Prince | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Sandro Pace-Bonello | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Felgate | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
MATT LIGHTFOOT | Trustee | 26 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Ben Balaam | Trustee | 07 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
JAN MILLER | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
David Bull | Trustee | 14 October 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.