Trustees MERSEYSIDE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 503957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Steer KC DL | Chair | 13 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Daragh O'Malley | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Elaine Graham | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ian Valentine-Burrows | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Calum Towers | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
SAM ROBINSON | Trustee | 30 September 2010 |
|
|||||
MR MIKE HUSSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Peter Daniel Oliver OBE DL | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARK BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN JAMES SEELEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.