Trustees HIGHBURY CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH
Charity number: 1159085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Wyatt | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darryl John Mills | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Simpson Buchanan | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Blazey | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jason Clare Boyd | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Cole | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAIN MACLEOD B ENG,MIEE | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROGER LESLIE GREGORY | Trustee | 05 March 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.