HIGHBURY CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1159085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jason Clare Boyd Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
IAIN MACLEOD B ENG,MIEE Trustee 02 March 2017 None on record
Susan Mary Cole Trustee 22 March 2018 None on record
ROGER LESLIE GREGORY Trustee 05 March 2009 None on record
Adrian Blazey Trustee 05 March 2020 None on record
Janet Hazel Partington Trustee 03 March 2016 None on record
Nephesha Mary Michael Trustee 22 March 2018 None on record
Angela Pickles Trustee 05 March 2020 None on record