HIGHBURY CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1159085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £93.03k £84.04k £83.18k £85.71k £110.37k
Total expenditure £134.80k £90.58k £84.17k £90.83k £101.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A