Financial history THE ROYAL NATIONAL COLLEGE FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 1000388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £6.17m £5.83m £5.64m £5.62m £7.76m
Total expenditure £8.85m £6.99m £5.64m £5.52m £6.24m
Income from government contracts £4.42m £4.08m £4.28m £4.54m £6.03m
Income from government grants £32.00k £41.00k £179.00k £244.00k £180.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £157.00k £225.00k £448.00k £507.00k £451.06k
Income - Other trading activities £861.00k £799.00k £392.00k £264.00k £414.00k
Income - Charitable activities £4.76m £4.44m £4.58m £4.82m £6.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £386.00k £346.00k £196.00k £20.00k £997
Income - Other £11.00k £13.00k £24.00k £12.00k £579.37k
Income - Legacies £21.00k £0 £76.00k £121.00k £45.64k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.03m £6.23m £5.15m £5.14m £5.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds £810.00k £756.00k £493.00k £376.00k £508.00k
Expenditure - Governance £29.00k £29.00k £29.00k £30.00k £46.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £2.01m £0 £0 £0 £0