Trustees BRENTWOOD CATHOLIC CHILDREN'S SOCIETY
Charity number: 1000661

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Tisi | Chair | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dean Cassar | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Beth Przybylska | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Santinelli | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katharine McKnight | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Wrench | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ferdinand Tisi | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Patmore | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MAIRE MAISCH | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Bemand-Qureshi | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin McClenaghan | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ray Keilthy | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Worsfold | Trustee | 10 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.