ALDEBURGH MUSIC CLUB

Charity number: 1000990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £58.06k £53.71k £51.04k £64.52k £48.32k
Total expenditure £54.38k £56.32k £57.23k £58.70k £39.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A