ALDEBURGH MUSIC CLUB

Charity number: 1000990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Mary Tye Trustee 01 December 2020
The Dallinghoo Church Repair Fund Received: On time
Helen Mower Trustee 11 December 2018 None on record
Teresa Jane Thomson Trustee 02 April 2019 None on record
Veronica Gillian Posford Trustee 17 October 2017 None on record
PETER CHARLES HOWARD-DOBSON Trustee 03 November 2013 None on record
MRS PENNY KAY Trustee None on record
Wendy Marshall Trustee 22 October 2019
THOMAS MARSHALL EDUCATION FUND Received: On time
Christopher Wheeler Trustee 22 October 2019
PROMETHEUS ORCHESTRA Received: On time