THE MORLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1001967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.66k £15.36k £23.36k £35.70k £33.17k
Total expenditure £16.98k £13.84k £15.32k £23.72k £48.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £350 £1.00k £1.80k