TAKE HEART

Charity number: 1002063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £173.71k £202.99k £213.94k £192.05k £258.78k
Total expenditure £118.67k £170.65k £509.38k £139.71k £333.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A