TAKE HEART

Charity number: 1002063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 30 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 26 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 26 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 08 January 2020 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 08 January 2020 39 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 25 January 2019 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 25 January 2019 56 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 20 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 November 2017 On time Download