TAKE HEART

Charity number: 1002063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL KAUFMAN Trustee None on record
Andrew Fitzpatrick Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
GINA MCGAWLEY Chair None on record
KEIRA KAROLINA ORCHARD Trustee 11 April 2013 None on record
COLIN PULLAN MBE Trustee None on record
Stephanie B C Kaufman Trustee 14 March 2018 None on record
Trevor Stephen Thompson Trustee 15 February 2019 None on record
JEFFREY WILDRIDGE Trustee None on record
MATTHEW WOOD Trustee 12 June 2012 None on record
John Wallace Hemingway Trustee 24 March 2014
SPENBOROUGH FORGET ME NOT FUND Received: On time
WILLIAM H B STEVENSON Trustee None on record
ALEC JAMES MCLEAN Trustee None on record
Maureen Ann Crosthwaite Trustee 13 October 2014 None on record