ST JOSEPH'S SCHOOL NOTTINGHAM

Charity number: 1003916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 September 2020 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 September 2020 79 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 07 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 07 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 23 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 23 March 2017 On time Download