Financial history AVOCET TRUST

Charity number: 1004537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.24m £6.25m £6.72m £6.64m £6.42m
Total expenditure £6.15m £5.92m £6.62m £6.71m £6.24m
Income from government contracts £0 £4.74m N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £17.48k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.24m £1.50m £6.45m £6.61m £6.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £16.68k £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £228.69k £32.34k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.15m £5.92m £6.62m £6.67m £6.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £66.37k £63.03k £33.70k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £12.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £36.84k £0