ABNEY PARK TRUST

Charity number: 1005334
Charity reporting is up to date (75 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 April 2021 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 April 2021 75 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 08 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 08 January 2017 On time Download