ABNEY PARK TRUST

Charity number: 1005334
Charity reporting is up to date (75 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John McShane Trustee 12 February 2020 None on record
Polly Jane Billington Trustee 11 March 2020 None on record
Benjamin Pass Trustee 08 September 2021 None on record
Elinor Roberts Trustee 11 August 2021 None on record
Dr Eva Rachel Sharpe Trustee 27 November 2018 None on record
Alison Bean Trustee 27 November 2018 None on record
Alison Rulton-Reed Trustee 08 September 2021 None on record
Tom Walker Chair 27 November 2018 None on record
Martina Girvan Trustee 08 September 2021 None on record
Susan Fajana-Thomas Trustee 05 November 2014 None on record
Roger William Chapman Trustee 27 November 2018
FRIENDS OF FINCHLEY YOUTH THEATRE Received: On time
THE FINCHLEY CHARITIES Received: On time
HENDON AND DISTRICT ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY Received: On time
Carol Irena Goldwag Trustee 06 September 2017 None on record
Christopher Geoffrey Sherwood Trustee 08 September 2021 None on record