ST CLEMENT AND ST JAMES COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT PROJECT

Charity number: 1009253
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VANESSA CASEY Trustee 18 October 2013 None on record
Richard Ryan Trustee 17 January 2018 None on record
Adekunle Awodele Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
BELINDA DAVIE Trustee 13 October 2011 None on record
Katherine Soanes Trustee 23 November 2016 None on record
SOPHIE LEWISOHN Trustee None on record
SETOR MENSAH LASSEY Trustee None on record
Joanna Gardner Trustee 14 November 2013 None on record
JULIAN KNOTT Chair 16 May 2013 None on record
Rev Gareth Wardell Trustee 15 May 2020 None on record
Manuel de Souza-Girao Trustee 17 January 2018 None on record