1ST ATTLEBOROUGH ST MARY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1012900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £20.29k £25.59k £23.92k £24.27k £31.32k
Total expenditure £22.36k £37.91k £22.81k £24.98k £13.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £20.67k