Financial history GREEK ARCHAEOLOGICAL COMMITTEE (UK)

Charity number: 1013176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £42.19k £47.22k £45.34k £40.05k £75.19k
Total expenditure £46.93k £46.89k £57.50k £58.52k £38.51k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A