Financial history OXFORDSHIRE MOTOR PROJECT

Charity number: 1013246
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £327.77k £361.52k £389.25k £728.14k £749.60k
Total expenditure £351.51k £366.82k £388.85k £564.59k £732.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £92.20k N/A £65.67k £43.33k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £18.71k £33.73k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £636.15k £654.88k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £6 £4
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £73.28k £61.00k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £564.59k £732.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £10.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0