Trustees OXFORDSHIRE MOTOR PROJECT

Charity number: 1013246
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Sweeney Trustee 23 May 2022
None on record
Carmen Hutchinson Trustee 12 April 2022
None on record
Nicolas Bernard Frederick Haudecoeur-Wilks Trustee 26 April 2021
None on record
Nicolas Haudecoeur-Wilks Trustee 26 April 2021
None on record
Cllr Rae Humberstone Trustee 01 January 2020
BLACKBIRD LEYS ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND
Received: On time
SARAH NOWELL'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ALICE SMITH TRUST
Received: On time
DR Simon John Draper Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record