CUMBRIA- RUNGWE COMMUNITY LINK

Charity number: 1014491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £28.97k £39.61k £33.21k £39.11k £22.79k
Total expenditure £69.93k £13.56k £45.50k £36.66k £13.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A