CUMBRIA- RUNGWE COMMUNITY LINK

Charity number: 1014491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 08 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 02 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 09 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 09 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 27 November 2017 On time Download