Trustees CUMBRIA- RUNGWE COMMUNITY LINK
Charity number: 1014491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Mary Lee | Chair | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Coan | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Reid Thompson | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Fowler | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Julia Flynn | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Geen | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stephen Lewthwaite | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Ellen Crowther | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Ellen Talbot Rogers | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Fisher | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Jordan Hannah Huddart | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christian White | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN THOMPSON | Trustee | 25 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
AMY MARIE IRELAND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.