Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE DEANERY C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1014938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required