Financial history FRIENDS OF THE DEANERY C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1014938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £21.90k £14.30k £22.57k £11.29k £1.49k
Total expenditure £25.57k £18.92k £12.17k £20.67k £1.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A