SOCIETY OF ACADEMIC & RESEARCH SURGERY

Charity number: 1015921
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £58.63k £58.57k £85.60k £43.24k £12.59k
Total expenditure £86.73k £72.99k £79.69k £43.96k £10.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A