Trustees GREAT OXENDON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1016964
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann Doris Corner Chair 01 June 2016
None on record
Kathleen Stephens Trustee 20 September 2017
None on record
janet scott hogarth Trustee 15 July 2016
None on record
Carolyn Jones Trustee 06 June 2016
None on record
Michael William Corner Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
Jacqueline Rumsey Trustee 17 May 2014
None on record
ROBERT BARKER Trustee
None on record