YOUNG MINDS TRUST

Charity number: 1016968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.91m £4.03m £5.03m £5.50m £9.71m
Total expenditure £3.14m £4.00m £4.37m £5.43m £5.01m
Income from government contracts £160.00k £295.19k £269.78k £322.17k £244.22k
Income from government grants £0 £144.03k £69.78k £32.77k £500.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.43m £2.42m £3.31m £4.02m £6.60m
Income - Other trading activities £734.17k £77.56k £634.37k £699.02k £421.81k
Income - Charitable activities £717.20k £1.52m £1.05m £767.99k £2.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.06k £9.15k £11.53k £12.60k £10.86k
Income - Other £28.80k £6.48k £21.25k £1.44k £2.69k
Income - Legacies £82.64k £68.12k £23.28k £15.10k £69.74k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.73m £3.46m £3.55m £4.30m £4.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £410.22k £536.90k £813.75k £1.13m £935.13k
Expenditure - Governance £13.35k £66.22k £117.68k £152.55k £185.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0